U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00486
  • Case Name: Peterson v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Return Mail]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2017: [Return Mail]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Recusal]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 05, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 15, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.