U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00490
  • Case Name: Gifford v. City of Blackfoot
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 02, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Docket Entry Order to File Lodged Document]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Protective Order]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 16, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.