U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00453
  • Case Name: Andrus v. US Department of Energy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Contempt Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Substitute Party]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • May 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Clarify]
  • April 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 19, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • February 19, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 09, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 06, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 19, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.