U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00491
  • Case Name: Rose v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Supplement]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • August 16, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 07, 2016: [Response (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 11, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 07, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 03, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • December 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • November 19, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 09, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • November 09, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Receipt]
  • October 20, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.