U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00487
  • Case Name: Dobson v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Consent Filed]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 20, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 20, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.