U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00439
  • Case Name: Smith v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Supplement]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.