U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00493
  • Case Name: Bettwieser v. Gans et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 14, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response to Objection to R&R]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • February 21, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • February 15, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 23, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 07, 2016: [Response (generic)]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Strike]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 08, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 20, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2015: [Receipt]
  • October 20, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.