U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00495
  • Case Name: Weimer v. Hansen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 26, 2016: [Stay]
  • July 26, 2016: [Request]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 16, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 02, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 02, 2016: [Request]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2016: [Default Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 14, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Letter]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 09, 2015: [Change Venue]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 21, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 21, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.