U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Flores v. United States Attorney General et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.