U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00488
  • Case Name: Hall v. Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2016: [Receipt]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Letter]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 22, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 22, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.