U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00500
  • Case Name: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 370 v. Wasden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Appeal Transcript Request]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • November 21, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 05, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 26, 2016: [File Amicus Brief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 17, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 18, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 17, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 14, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2015: [Errata]
  • November 17, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 22, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 22, 2015: [Errata]
  • October 22, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.