U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00501
  • Case Name: Penaloza-Paramo v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Request]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Request]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Request]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Request]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Response (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • October 23, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 23, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.