U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 01, 2015: [Letter]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Receipt]
  • November 10, 2015: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2015: [Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Disqualify Judge]
  • October 28, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 28, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.