U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00509
  • Case Name: Mieyr v. City of Nampa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 22, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Report of Mediation]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Consent to Mediation]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [In Limine]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2016: [Exclude]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 26, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 26, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 15, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 29, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.