U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00511
  • Case Name: Mendoza v. Collection Bureau Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2016: [Enforce Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 08, 2015: [Judgment Offer Accepted (Notice of Acceptance)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 29, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.