U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00512
  • Case Name: Meyer v. Poulson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 29, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 29, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • October 29, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 29, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 29, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.