U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00513
  • Case Name: Tiller v. Canyon County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 24, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Summons Issued]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.