U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00514
  • Case Name: AIG Specialty Insurance Company v. Owyhee Construction, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 20, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 29, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 10, 2015: [Errata]
  • November 02, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.