U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00510
  • Case Name: Idaho Pacific Corporation v. Binex Line Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 16, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 15, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 15, 2015: [Strike]
  • December 11, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 01, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 18, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Strike]
  • November 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 30, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 30, 2015: [Transfer Case]
  • October 30, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 30, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.