U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00517
  • Case Name: Hackwith v. Magnuson, McHugh & Company, P.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Status Report]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 03, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Errata]
  • April 19, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Statement]
  • April 11, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • April 05, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 05, 2016: [Consent Filed]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Errata]
  • February 24, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 02, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.