U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00518
  • Case Name: Weimer v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • January 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Change Venue]
  • November 23, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • November 10, 2015: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • November 03, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 03, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.