U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00519
  • Case Name: Northness v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 02, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • February 02, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 03, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 03, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 03, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.