U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00515
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Little
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 11, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Strike]
  • July 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Stay]
  • April 30, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2018: [Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2018: [Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Response (generic)]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • June 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • May 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 04, 2017: [Response (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 27, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • May 13, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2016: [Supplement]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [Stay]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2016: [Expedite]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 18, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 03, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 03, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.