U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Conerly v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 03, 2015: [Complaint]
  • November 03, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 03, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.