U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00520
  • Case Name: Edmark Auto, Inc. et al v. Zurich, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Stay]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • October 07, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 20, 2019: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • August 16, 2019: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • August 16, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • August 12, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 07, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 07, 2019: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 30, 2019: [Expedite]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 30, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 29, 2019: [Stay]
  • July 24, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 10, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Special Verdict Form]
  • June 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2019: [Jury Notes]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 19, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 19, 2019: [Seal]
  • June 18, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 18, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 17, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 13, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 12, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 10, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 10, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 07, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • June 07, 2019: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 04, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 23, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 16, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2019: [Seal]
  • May 09, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 09, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • May 09, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 09, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 09, 2018: [Seal]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 19, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 28, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 28, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 21, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 09, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 09, 2018: [Clarify]
  • August 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 17, 2018: [Seal]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 07, 2018: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 02, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 01, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 01, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 01, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 09, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 02, 2018: [Compel]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • March 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • March 19, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • March 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 20, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 15, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • December 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 22, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 21, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 13, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • November 10, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2017: [Seal Document]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 23, 2017: [Seal]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 18, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Compel]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • September 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2017: [Seal]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 14, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2017: [Statement]
  • August 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Status Report]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 20, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 14, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • July 14, 2017: [Seal]
  • July 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2017: [Seal]
  • July 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Protective Order]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2017: [Statement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 03, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Response (generic)]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 20, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 15, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 17, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 16, 2016: [Strike]
  • February 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Protective Order]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Stay]
  • January 08, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 07, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 04, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 10, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 04, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.