U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00523
  • Case Name: Steiner-Leach v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • February 02, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 19, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 18, 2015: [Receipt]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 04, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 04, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 04, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.