U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00264
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 12 Calle Pelicano, San Clemente, Orange County, Californi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 11, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Service by Publication]
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 14, 2015: [Claim]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 19, 2015: [Claim]
  • November 05, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.