U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00526
  • Case Name: Dowton et al v. Tingey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • January 19, 2016: [Expedite]
  • January 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 03, 2015: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 05, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 05, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • November 05, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.