U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00525
  • Case Name: Herrera v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Supplement]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 02, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 01, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Request]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • August 16, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Hearing]
  • June 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order Reopening Case]
  • May 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Request]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2018: [Reopen Case]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Request]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • January 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Consent Filed]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 05, 2015: [Stay]
  • November 05, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 05, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 05, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.