U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00527
  • Case Name: Koehler et al v. Payless Shoesource, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [ADR Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 24, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • February 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.