U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00530
  • Case Name: Estep v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 05, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Attorney on Appeal]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Request]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2017: [Request]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 23, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Hearing]
  • October 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • August 18, 2016: [Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 09, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 09, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.