U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response (generic)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • August 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 26, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Joinder]
  • June 23, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2016: [Receipt]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 09, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Complaint]
  • November 09, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.