U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00532
  • Case Name: Wright v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 25, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 10, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.