U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00533
  • Case Name: Herrick et al v. Potandon Produce, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 06, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [ADR Plan]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 24, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 18, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2015: [Counterclaim]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 11, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.