U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00460
  • Case Name: Frantz et al v. Idaho Independent Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 29, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2015: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • December 14, 2015: [Excerpt of Record]
  • December 14, 2015: [Appellees Brief]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Excerpt of Record]
  • November 12, 2015: [Appellants Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.