U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00504
  • Case Name: In Re: Ricks
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 12, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 17, 2016: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • February 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 09, 2016: [Joinder]
  • February 08, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Excerpt of Record]
  • February 03, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • February 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2016: [Expedite]
  • February 02, 2016: [Stay]
  • February 02, 2016: [Joinder]
  • February 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 01, 2016: [Excerpt of Record]
  • February 01, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Excerpt of Record]
  • December 31, 2015: [Appellants Brief]
  • December 15, 2015: [Certificate of Readiness]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2015: [Designations of Record]
  • November 16, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Designations of Record]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.