U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00534
  • Case Name: Egan v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • February 11, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 02, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 16, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 12, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.