U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00531
  • Case Name: Parsons v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 21, 2019: [Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Request]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Request]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Traverse]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Produce]
  • August 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2016: [Discovery]
  • August 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 09, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • July 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 13, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 13, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 13, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.