U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00536
  • Case Name: Ireland v. RTR1, LLC d/b/a Ruby Tuesday
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 13, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.