U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00550
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 09, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 09, 2016: [Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 12, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • January 06, 2016: [Supplement]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2015: [Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 10, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 10, 2015: [Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 25, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 24, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 24, 2015: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.