U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00551
  • Case Name: Born v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Request]
  • April 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 01, 2015: [Supplement]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • November 24, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.