U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00554
  • Case Name: Leoni v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • February 17, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 25, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 25, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 24, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 24, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.