U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00555
  • Case Name: Slaugh v. Neidigh
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 12, 2018: [Status Report]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Status Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Status Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Status Report]
  • July 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 26, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 22, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Status Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Affidavit]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Enforce Judgment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sanctions]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 13, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 12, 2018: [Enforce Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • October 02, 2017: [Clarify]
  • October 01, 2017: [Certify]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Declaration]
  • June 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 12, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 06, 2017: [Transcript Request]
May, 2017
  • May 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Transcript Request]
  • May 04, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 04, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Receipt]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Strike]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 22, 2017: [Statement]
  • February 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 08, 2017: [Strike]
  • February 03, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 16, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • November 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 21, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 20, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 18, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2016: [Continue]
  • February 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 27, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 28, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 07, 2015: [Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 24, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.