U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00556
  • Case Name: Chavez-Salto v. Bible et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 04, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 01, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 01, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.