U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00557
  • Case Name: Planned Parenthood of the Great Northwest and the Hawaiian Islands v. Wasden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Return Mail]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [ADR Plan]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • March 23, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order]
  • January 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 10, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.