U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Taylor et al v. Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 16, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • July 17, 2020: [Expedite]
  • July 16, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • July 16, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 05, 2020: [Reply (generic)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Statement]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 28, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Statement]
  • May 26, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2020: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • April 29, 2020: [Joinder]
  • April 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Joinder]
  • April 14, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 13, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 13, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Joinder]
  • April 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2020: [Exclude]
  • April 07, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 31, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 30, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • March 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 11, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • March 05, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 05, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • March 03, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 23, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • February 20, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 19, 2020: [Expedite]
  • February 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 07, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2020: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 27, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2020: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • January 22, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 21, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • January 12, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • January 10, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • January 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 09, 2020: [Discovery]
  • January 08, 2020: [File Amicus Brief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 08, 2020: [Recusal]
  • January 08, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 07, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • December 26, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 26, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Expedite]
  • December 20, 2019: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 19, 2019: [Joinder]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Expedite]
  • December 18, 2019: [Take Deposition]
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • December 13, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response (generic)]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2019: [Response (generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 23, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 21, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 18, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • October 04, 2019: [Clarify]
  • October 04, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 24, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Status Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 13, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 29, 2019: [Joinder]
  • July 29, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • July 29, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 22, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • July 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2019: [Joinder]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Expedite]
  • July 08, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 08, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sanctions]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 25, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Joinder]
  • June 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 19, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • June 18, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Supplement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Joinder]
  • June 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 06, 2019: [Declaration]
  • June 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Compel]
  • June 04, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 04, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Strike]
  • May 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Discovery]
  • May 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 21, 2019: [Errata]
  • May 21, 2019: [Expedite]
  • May 20, 2019: [Compel]
  • May 16, 2019: [Compel]
  • May 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2019: [Strike]
  • May 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2019: [Errata]
  • March 01, 2019: [Joinder]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 30, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2019: [Errata]
  • January 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 07, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order]
  • December 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • December 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 18, 2018: [Compel]
  • December 18, 2018: [Errata]
  • December 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2018: [Compel]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2018: [Relief]
  • December 03, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Clarify]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 15, 2018: [Errata]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 24, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 01, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 01, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 17, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 10, 2018: [Vacate]
  • September 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 06, 2018: [Compel]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 30, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 30, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 03, 2018: [Errata]
  • July 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Status Report]
  • June 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Joinder]
  • June 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 31, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 11, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 04, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • April 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 30, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sanctions]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • March 15, 2018: [Errata]
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 07, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 27, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • February 27, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 22, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 16, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 14, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 29, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Death]
  • January 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 21, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 21, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 05, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 04, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2017: [Crossclaim]
  • December 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 04, 2017: [Counterclaim]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2017: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 15, 2017: [Crossclaim]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2017: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 31, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • October 31, 2017: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 24, 2017: [Crossclaim]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • October 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 19, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 05, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 14, 2017: [More Definite Statement]
  • August 14, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2017: [Errata]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 03, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 22, 2017: [Third Party Complaint]
  • May 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • May 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 06, 2017: [Errata]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 25, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 31, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 31, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 05, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 12, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 11, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2016: [Intervene]
  • July 18, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 20, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 30, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • May 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2016: [Status Report]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 08, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 02, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • February 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 30, 2015: [USCA Memorandum]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2015: [USCA Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.