U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00561
  • Case Name: Layton v. Floyd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 02, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 03, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.