U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00562
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. JR Simplot Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Consent Decree]
  • April 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Approve Consent Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.