U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00565
  • Case Name: Briciu v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Affidavit]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • December 04, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.