U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00566
  • Case Name: Exergy Development Group of Idaho, LLC v. Fagen, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 22, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 22, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 16, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 04, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.